IL HB2842 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that applicants for local siting approval shall submit evidence to demonstrate compliance. Provides that applicants for local siting approval shall present testimony subject to cross-examination at specified public hearings. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-LOCAL SITING REVIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0382 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-001 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 39.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |