IL HB2840 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases the minimum mandatory coverage amounts for liability insurance policies in this State and increases the amounts sufficient to satisfy a judgment following a motor vehicle accident as follows: bodily injury or death to any one person from $25,000 to $50,000; bodily injury or death to more than one person from $50,000 to $100,000; and injury or destruction of property of others from $20,000 to $40,000.
Title
VEH CD-MINIMUM AUTO COVERAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-001 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-164.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-606 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 12-707.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |