IL HB2836 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0487
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that, subject to the provisions of the Public Contract Fraud Act, the State Treasurer is authorized during fiscal years 2019 and 2020 to purchase real property located in the City of Springfield, Illinois which the State Treasurer deems necessary to properly carry out the powers and duties vested in him or her. Provides that, subject to provisions of the Treasurer's Procurement Rules, the State Treasurer may enter into contracts relating to construction, reconstruction, or renovation projects for any such buildings or lands acquired under this Act, and the State Treasurer may equip, lease, operate, and maintain those grounds, buildings, and facilities as may be appropriate to carry out the State Treasurer's statutory purposes and duties. Provides that the State Treasurer may enter into agreements with any person with respect to the use and occupancy of the grounds, buildings, and facilities of the State Treasurer, including concession, license, and lease agreements on terms and conditions as the State Treasurer determines and in accordance with the procurement processes for the Office of the State Treasurer, which shall be substantially in accordance with the requirements of Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that exercise of the authority vested by this Act is subject to the appropriation of the necessary funds. Amends the State Finance Act. Expands the use of moneys in the State Pension Fund to include the acquisition of land and buildings in State fiscal year 2019 and 2020 for use by the Office of the State Treasurer, as well as construction, reconstruction, improvement, repair, and maintenance, in accordance with the provisions of laws relating thereto, of such lands and buildings beginning in State fiscal year 2019 and thereafter. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE TREASURER-REAL PROPERTY
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0487 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-010-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 8.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |