IL HB2835 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Crude Oil Pipeline Environmental Liability Insurance Act. Provides that all owners of crude oil pipelines transporting more than a specified amount of bitumen shall report such pipelines to the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency. Provides that on January 1, 2018 all owners of crude oil pipelines that transported more than a specified amount of bitumen over the preceding calendar year, shall maintain insurance coverage for such pipelines. Provides that after January 1, 2018 all owners of crude oil pipelines transporting more than a specified amount of bitumen shall obtain insurance coverage for such pipelines. Contains provisions specifying the requirements for insurance coverage and concerning the duties of the owners of such pipelines, the Agency, and insurance companies in relation to such insurance. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
UTILITY-OIL PIPELINE INSURANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To Environmental Regulations Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2835&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2835.htm |