IL HB2834 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall not enter into any new EDGE Agreements after December 31, 2021 (currently, December 31, 2016). Effective immediately.
Title
EDGE-SUNSET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 10 | 5-77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2834&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2834.htm |