IL HB2830 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0486
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Visitation Rights Act. Prohibits an employer from terminating an employee because of an absence from work due to employee's attendance at a school conference or activity. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL CONFERENCE NO TERMINATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0486
2019-08-23HouseEffective Date August 1, 2020
2019-08-23HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-008-001
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed
2019-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed
2019-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Note Filed as Amended
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-002-001
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Corrections Budget and Impact Note Filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Budget & Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Balance Budget Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseArrived in House
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 015-000-000
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Labor; 015-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-005-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82014735Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2830&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2830.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2830eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2830enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0486.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2830ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2830ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2830sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2830_04032019_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB2830_05212019_070000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB2830sam001_05302019_019000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback