IL HB2828 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides for the reinstatement of a lapsed Professional Educator License upon the payment by the applicant of the lesser of a $100 penalty or a $10 penalty for each year the license has lapsed (rather than a $500 penalty). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-LAPSED EDUCATOR LICENSE
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001 |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |