IL HB2827 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0436
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Health Care Professional Credentials Data Collection Act. Provides that "recredentialing" and "single credentialing cycle" must be undertaken for a period not to exceed 3 years (rather than once every 2 years). Provides that forms established by the Department of Public Health under the provisions shall be available in both paper and electronic formats upon request and in the format requested (rather than just in both paper and electronic formats). Repeals provisions establishing the Health Care Credentials Council and makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONAL DATA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-11 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-04HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0436
2023-08-04HouseEffective Date August 4, 2023
2023-08-04HouseGovernor Approved
2023-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2023-05-11HousePassed Both Houses
2023-05-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2023-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
2023-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
2023-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2023-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
2023-04-12SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2023-03-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-03-23SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2023-03-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2023-03-23SenateArrive in Senate
2023-03-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2023-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2023-03-22HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2023-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
2023-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-02HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
2023-02-23HouseAssigned to Public Health Committee
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41051710Repealed CodeCitation Text
41051715Amended CodeCitation Text
41051720Amended CodeCitation Text
41051725Amended CodeCitation Text
41051730Amended CodeCitation Text
41051735Amended CodeCitation Text
4105175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback