IL HB2825 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois and Michigan Canal Development Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law or restrictions on sale, the Village of Lemont may exchange with a nongovernmental entity the Illinois and Michigan Canal lands that were purchased from the State for other real property of substantially equal or greater value, as determined by 2 MAI appraisals of the properties, and of substantially the same or greater suitability for recreational, park, and parking purposes without additional cost to the Village. Provides that the property being transferred to the Village must be continuous to other Illinois and Michigan Canal lands owned by the Village. Provides that, prior to an exchange with a nongovernmental entity, the Village board shall hold a public hearing in order to consider the proposed exchange. Provides that notice of such meeting shall be published at least twice, with the first and last publication being at least 10 days apart, in a newspaper of general circulation within the Village. Provides that the language authorizing an exchange of property between the Village of Lemont and a nongovernmental agency applies only to specified property.
Title
MINOR GUARDIANSHIP-GAL DUTIES
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0915 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-001 |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Cities & Villages Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-04-05 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Curran |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 5, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 4, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11-10.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |