IL HB2823 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that an indication of an apparent owner's interest in property includes (rather than excludes) an automatic reinvestment of dividends or interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RUUPA-AUTOMATIC REINVESTMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-18HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith P. Sommer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
765102615-210Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback