IL HB2823 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides in various provisions an exemption to carry a firearm on Department of Natural Resources property in accordance with the Firearm Concealed Carry Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE CD-FIREARM EXEMPTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.11Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.26Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.33Amended CodeCitation Text
52052.34Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback