IL HB2822 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Motion Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. In the statute concerning unlawful use of weapons that prohibits the knowing sale, manufacture, purchase, possession, or carrying of any rifle having one or more barrels less than 16 inches in length or a shotgun having one or more barrels less than 18 inches in length or any weapon made from a rifle or shotgun, deletes "whether by alteration, modification, or otherwise, if such a weapon as modified has an overall length of less than 26 inches". In the exemption statute, permits an active member of a bona fide, nationally recognized military re-enacting group to have a rifle with a barrel or barrels less than 16 inches in length if the modification is required and necessary to accurately portray the weapon for historical re-enactment purposes; and the re-enactor is in possession of a valid and current re-enacting group membership credential. Deletes that the overall length of the weapon as modified must be not less than 26 inches. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-UUW--RELICS&REENACTOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HouseMotion Tabled
2017-05-30HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-30HouseMotion Discharge Committee Tabled
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-15HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback