IL HB2816 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Materials Reuse and Recycling Act. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall require that for all new construction projects that at least 5% of the materials used for the construction project are reused materials. Provides that no municipality or county may adopt a building code that requires the use of all new materials in the building's construction. Provides that any model building code adopted by a municipality or county must be adapted to allow for use of reused materials, recycled materials, and reclaimed materials. Provides that reuse of used, recycled, or reclaimed construction materials shall be allowed as of right in all municipal, county, or statewide building codes as of the effective date of the Act. Provides that the Agency shall prepare an annual report to the General Assembly on the amount of construction and demolition waste created in the State that includes specified information. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
MATERIALS REUSE-RECYCLING
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2816&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2816.htm |