IL HB2807 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the maximum reduction under the senior citizens homestead exemption is $8,000 in all counties (currently, $8,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $5,000 in all other counties). Provides that, for taxable years 2019 and thereafter, the maximum reduction under the general homestead exemption is $10,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $8,000 in all other counties (currently, $10,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $6,000 in all other counties). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-HOMESTEAD EXEMPTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2807&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2807.htm |