IL HB2805 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that if an application for a vote by mail ballot is sent to a post office box controlled by any individual or organization that is not an election authority, the applications shall be turned over to the appropriate election authority within 14 days of receipt. Provides that failure to turn over the applications in a timely manner constitutes a violation of the Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-VOTE BY MAIL APP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-04-27SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-10HouseTo Ballot Access Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10519-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback