IL HB2803 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides for a continuing appropriation for each State agency to meet personnel expenditures for each payroll period during which appropriations for personnel expenditures have not been made available to that State agency. Defines "State agency" to include all State agencies, the office of any constitutional officer, and any agency, board, commission, or other instrumentality of State government to which an appropriation for personnel expenditures was made from a State fund in FY15. Defines "personnel expenditure" and "applicable State fund". Effective immediately.
Title
STATE GOVT-CONTINUING APPROP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-02-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-02-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 50-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2803&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2803.htm |