IL HB2801 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Inter-Agency Report on Decarbonization and Economic Opportunities Act. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, the Illinois Commerce Commission, the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, and the Illinois Power Agency to work jointly to design a broad-based policy approach, including specific programs, to decarbonize Illinois' electric sector (including energy production and consumption) in a just and equitable way that puts our State on track to phase out polluting power plants by 2030 and create new economic opportunities across the State. Effective immediately.
Title
DECARBONIZATION-REPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-06 | House | To Renewable Initiatives Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2801&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2801.htm |