IL HB2800 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986. Provides that a domestic or foreign corporation shall, in its annual report, supply the rural route number, if applicable, for the address of its principal office. Provides that the Secretary of State may not consider a request submitted by electronic means a request for expedited services solely because of its submission by electronic means, unless expedited service is requested by the filer. Provides that the Secretary may not provide expedited services for the online electronic filing of annual reports or requests for certificates of good standing or certificates of existence under the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986, the Limited Liability Company Act, and the Uniform Partnership Act (1997). Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
BUSINESS FILING-EXPEDITE, FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0578 |
2019-08-26 | House | Effective Date August 26, 2019 |
2019-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 105 | 114.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 105 | 115.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 50-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 206 | 1209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |