IL HB2799 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that a State purchasing officer or chief procurement officer may award a sole source contract to a qualified HUBZone small business concern, subject to certain restrictions. Provides that, if a contract is awarded pursuant to a competitive bidding process, the price offered by a qualified HUBZone small business concern shall be deemed to be lower than the price offered by another responsible bidder if the price offered by the qualified HUBZone small business concern is not more than 10% higher than the price offered by the other responsible bidder. Provides that the term "qualified HUBZone small business concern" means a business located in the State that qualifies as a HUBZone small business concern under the Historically Underutilized Business Zones (HUBZone) program administered by the United States Small Business Administration.
Title
PROCUREMENT-HUBZONES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2799&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2799.htm |