IL HB2798 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that in every case in which an opioid overdose is determined to be a contributing factor in a death, the coroner shall report the death and the age, gender, race, and county of residence, if known, of the decedent to the Department of Public Health. Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act and the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires every hospital to report the age, gender, race, and county of residence, if known, of each patient diagnosed as having an opioid overdose to the Department within 48 hours of the diagnosis. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department to adopt rules to implement the reporting requirements. Requires the Department to annually report to the General Assembly the data collected.
Title
OPIOID OVERDOSE REPORTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 330 | 8b | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-316 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 85 | 6.09c | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 3-3013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |