IL HB2797 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that an injury arises out of and in the course of employment only if the accident significantly caused or contributed to both the resulting condition and the disability. Provides that an injury does not arise out of and in the course of employment if (1) the hazard or risk was not incidental to employment and was a hazard or risk to which the general public is also exposed, (2) the injury did not occur at a time and place and under circumstances reasonably required by the employment, or (3) the disability resulted from a personal risk. Limits conditions under which repetitive or cumulative trauma is compensable. Provides that gradual deterioration or progressive degeneration of the body caused by aging is not compensable as repetitive or cumulative trauma. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKERS COMP-CAUSATION
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] |
Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2797&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2797.htm |