IL HB2796 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that for purposes of awarding compensation for injuries, an injury to the shoulder shall be considered an injury to a part of the arm and an injury to the hip shall be considered an injury to a part of the leg. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKERS COMP-SHOULDER HIP
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] |
Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2796&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2796.htm |