IL HB2794 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act in relation to custom compound medications. Sets forth conditions for approval of payment. Provides that charges shall be based upon the specific amount of each component drug and its original manufacturer's National Drug Code number and also upon specified criteria. Provides that a provider may prescribe a one-time 7-day supply unless a prescription for more than 7 days is preauthorized by the employer. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKERS COMP-COMPOUND DRUGS
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] |
Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 8.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2794&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2794.htm |