IL HB2794 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school board shall require the school district's high schools, if any, to inform all 11th and 12th grade students of dual enrollment and dual credit opportunities at public community colleges for qualified students.
Title
VOCATIONAL ACADEMY-CHARTER SCH
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0133 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-023-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |