IL HB2792 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that an individual taxpayer age 65 or older is entitled to the earned income tax credit without regard to the requirement under the federal Internal Revenue Code that an individual taxpayer without a qualifying child has not attained age 65. Provides that an individual taxpayer age 18 to 24 is entitled to the earned income tax credit without regard to the requirement under the federal Internal Revenue Code that an individual taxpayer without a qualifying child has attained the age of 25. Provides that certain taxpayers using individual tax identification numbers are entitled to the earned income tax credit. Creates the eligible dependent tax credit. Provides that the total amount of credits between the eligible dependent tax credit and the earned income tax credit may not be less than $600. Amends the Earned Income Tax Credit Information Act to delete certain provisions concerning dependent children. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-EARNED INCOME CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2021-04-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2021-04-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-04-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2021-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2021-04-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2021-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-25HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2021-03-25HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-002-000
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-03-18HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-02-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355212Amended CodeCitation Text
355212.1New CodeSee Bill Text
8201705Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback