IL HB2789 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning standards for schools, provides that the State Board of Education may issue, refuse to issue, or revoke recognition (rather than may issue, refuse to issue, or revoke certificates of recognition) for schools. Provides that the State Board of Education may revoke recognition for schools that fail to comply with public health requirements issued by the Illinois Department of Public Health when a public health emergency is declared by the Governor. Amends provisions concerning the registration and recognition of nonpublic schools by requiring a nonpublic school to comply with public health requirements issued by the Illinois Department of Public Health during a public health emergency. Prohibits a school board from passing any resolution that is in contravention of any requirement established by the Illinois Department of Public Health during a public health emergency. Makes similar changes to provisions concerning the licensure powers of the State Board of Education. In provisions concerning the Chicago school district, public schools, and nonpublic schools, requires a school to comply with all public health requirements issued by the Illinois Department of Public Health during a declared public health emergency. Requires schools to investigate complaints of noncompliance with the public health requirements; sets forth complaint procedures. Provides that the State Superintendent of Education may require a school to operate fully remotely if the public health requirements are not followed. Sets forth penalty provisions. Provides for rulemaking by the State Board of Education. Makes a corresponding change in the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL-PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2021-05-27SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 010-006-001
2021-05-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-05-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-000
2021-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-009-000
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-007-000
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-6Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.67New CodeSee Bill Text
1102059.40New CodeSee Bill Text
2023102310-705New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback