IL HB2786 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Permits school-aged children under the age of 18 to use the statewide toll-free telephone number established under the Act to report alleged incidents of bullying or hazing that occur at their school. Provides that children who report an alleged incident of bullying or hazing to the statewide toll-free telephone number may remain anonymous. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to provide callers with information on how to handle an alleged incident of bullying or hazing, which may include a list of available resources developed or provided by other federal or State agencies concerning bullying or hazing prevention. Provides that upon receipt of a child's report of bullying or hazing, the Department shall report the incident as soon as possible to the superintendent of the school district in which the child resides or, if the child attends a non-public school, the administrator of the non-public school. Provides that reports of bullying or hazing made to the statewide toll-free telephone number shall not initiate a child abuse or neglect investigation under the Act. Requires the Department to (i) inform all school districts and non-public schools of the statewide toll-free telephone number and its function to receive reports of bullying or hazing and (ii) post on its website, in a relevant and conspicuous place, information on how a child can report an alleged incident of bullying or hazing to the statewide toll-free telephone number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-HOTLINE-BULLYING & HAZING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-04-03HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-03-28HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-002-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32557.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback