IL HB2785 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the Department of State Police must notify the applicant stating detailed grounds for the denial and the applicant's right to receive copies of all documents and other evidence that was provided to the Department concerning the application. Provides that in the event that an applicant is denied a license, a copy of any and all objections made by law enforcement agencies shall be made available to the applicant. Provides that upon the referral, applicants shall be given notice by the Department that the application is undergoing review by the Board. Provides that the notice shall include the next date upon which the Concealed Carry Licensing Review Board is expected to convene, and shall inform the applicant that the 90-day time period has been tolled. Provides that all documents and evidence provided to the Board, including a list of the names of all witnesses who provided testimony to the Board, shall be made available to the applicant and the applicant's designated attorney, if any. Provides that an applicant may appeal a denial of an application for a concealed carry license by the Department to the Director for a hearing within 70 calendar days after the denial is delivered to the address listed on the application. Provides that the time deadline for filing a petition for administrative or judicial review shall be 70 calendar days from the date the notice of denial was received by the applicant. Provides that if an applicant brings a petition for judicial review under the Act, the petition must be decided without remand to the Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-LICENSE DENIAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306610Amended CodeCitation Text
4306615Amended CodeCitation Text
4306620Amended CodeCitation Text
4306670Amended CodeCitation Text
4306687Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback