IL HB2778 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Fire Protection of Unprotected Area Act. Provides that if a property owner of an unprotected area refuses a request for annexation for fire protection, the State Fire Marshal shall assign the unprotected area coverage. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that in order to obtain property insurance for property located in an unincorporated area of a county, the owner of the property must submit verification that the property has fire protection coverage by a fire protection jurisdiction. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-PROOF OF FIRE COVERAGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 86 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0547
2017-11-09HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-11-08HouseBoth Houses Override Total Veto
2017-11-08SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 050-002-000
2017-11-08Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-11-01SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto
2017-10-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-10-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-10-25HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 086-029-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-10-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-10-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-10-12HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-10-12HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-012-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2017
2017-05-17SenateDo Pass Local Government; 006-000-003
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-040-000
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 003-001-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Fire & Emergency Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155143.10dNew CodeSee Bill Text
707153Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2778&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2778.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2778eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2778enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2778gms.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0547.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2778ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2778_04252017_016000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2778_05302017_038000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2778_10252017_017000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2778_11082017_004000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback