IL HB2778 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on December 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on December 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that a currently licensed EMT may perform emergency and non-emergency medical services in accordance with his or her level of education, training, and licensure, regardless of the level (BLS, ILS, or ALS) of the ambulance to which he or she is assigned when performing those services.
Title
EMS-EMT-AMBULNC-SCOPE PRACTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0608 |
2013-12-27 | House | Effective Date December 27, 2013 |
2013-12-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-10-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-10-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-10-23 | House | House Concurs |
2013-10-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000 |
2013-10-23 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2013-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-10-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-10-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-10-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-10-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-22 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-03-22 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Al Riley |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001 |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |