IL HB2776 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Provides that the rates and minimum mandated wage increases for homemaker services shall be, at a minimum, as of January 1, 2019, a rate of $19.96 per hour, for a minimum wage of $12 per hour, and as of July 1, 2019, a rate of $21.64 per hour for a minimum wage of $13 per hour. Provides that rates in future State fiscal years shall be no lower than the rates in effect on July 1, 2019. Provides that in-home service provider agencies shall be required to certify to the Department on Aging that they are in compliance with the mandated wage increase for direct service workers. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, any paid time off, payment for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation payment, shall not be reduced in relation to these rate increases. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGING-HOMEMAKER SERVICES-WAGES

Sponsors

Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]Rep. Jehan Gordon [D]Rep. Delia Ramirez [D]Rep. Theresa Mah [D]
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D]Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D]
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D]Rep. Luis Arroyo [D]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D]
Rep. Ann Williams [D]Rep. Marcus Evans [D]Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. Andre Thapedi [D]
Rep. Anna Moeller [D]Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]Rep. Frances Hurley [D]
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D]Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Diane Pappas [D]Rep. Rita Mayfield [D]
Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D]Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D]Rep. Martin Moylan [D]Rep. Carol Ammons [D]
Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Robert Rita [D]Rep. William Davis [D]Rep. Robyn Gabel [D]
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D]Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D]
Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]Rep. Nicholas Smith [D]Rep. Sara Feigenholtz [D]
Rep. Celina Villanueva [D]Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Sonya Harper [D]Rep. Michael Halpin [D]
Rep. Daniel Didech [D]Rep. Will Guzzardi [D]Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D]Rep. Maurice West [D]
Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D]Rep. Monica Bristow [D]Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D]Rep. John Connor [D]
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]Rep. Mark Walker [D]Rep. Bob Morgan [D]Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D]
Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D]Rep. Joyce Mason [D]Rep. Kambium Buckner [D]Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D]
Rep. Camille Lilly [D]Rep. Lamont Robinson [D]Rep. Mary Edly-Allen [D]Rep. Curtis Tarver [D]
Sen. Robert Martwick [D]Rep. Karina Villa [D]Rep. Arthur Turner [D]Rep. Lance Yednock [D]
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]Rep. David Welter [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-22HouseTo Wages & Rates Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback