IL HB2773 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that school districts shall teach students how to read using phonics.
Title
SCH CD-PHONICS EDUCATION
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |