IL HB2771 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Healthy Workplace Act and amends the State Finance Act. Requires employers to provide specified paid sick days to employees. Sets forth the purposes for and manner in which the sick days may be used. Contains provisions regarding employer responsibilities, unlawful employer practices, and other matters. Provides that the Department of Labor shall administer the Act. Authorizes the imposition of civil penalties. Authorizes individuals to file civil actions with respect to violations. Creates the Healthy Workplace Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTHY WORKPLACE ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 066-051-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 007-005-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Economic Opportunity Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback