IL HB2768 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In a Section concerning a principal's duties (in a school district other than the Chicago school district), provides that it shall be the responsibility of the principal to utilize resources of proper law enforcement agencies when the safety and welfare of students and teachers are threatened by illegal use or possession of weapons or by illegal gang activity. Specifically includes illegal gang activity as a criminal offense for which courts and law enforcement agencies must report to the principal of a public school whenever a child enrolled therein is detained.
Title
SCH CD-REPORT GANG ACTIVITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0059 |
2013-07-08 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-07-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-005-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 009-000-001 |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-21.4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 22-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |