IL HB2752 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Requires that applications for certification, registration, and licensure must contain specific language that states that the applicant is not obligated to disclose sealed or expunged records of conviction or arrest and prohibits entities authorized to grant professional licenses, certifications, and registrations from asking if an applicant has had records expunged or sealed. Provides that certain sealed or impounded felony records shall not be disseminated in connection with an application for a professional or business license, registration, or certification, except specified health care worker licenses. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that the Director of Insurance must find that a resident insurance producer or public adjuster applicant has not committed certain acts or has been sufficiently rehabilitated to approve the application. In provisions concerning license denial, nonrenewal, or revocation for conviction of a felony, allows the Director to issue a license with monitoring requirements and provides for an exception if an individual demonstrates to the Director sufficient rehabilitation to warrant the public trust. Provides that the Department of Insurance shall not require applicants to report certain criminal history information and the Department shall not consider the information. Requires the Department to consider certain mitigating factors and evidence of rehabilitation for license applicants. Requires the Department, upon denial of a license, to provide the applicant certain information concerning the denial. Provides that on May 1 of each year, the Department shall prepare, publicly announce, and publish certain statistical information. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
INS CD-CRIMINAL HISTORY
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 005-002-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 006-002-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-08 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2630 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 1525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 1550 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 1555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-76 | New Code | See Bill Text |