IL HB2741 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that court-ordered counseling is subject to the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Confidentiality Act and the federal Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996. Deletes language providing that: all counseling sessions shall be confidential; and communications in counseling shall not be used in any manner in litigation nor relied upon by any expert appointed by the court or retained by any party. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-STEP-PARENT; COUNSELING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-27HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
2021-05-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021
2021-05-06SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2021
2021-05-04SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-04-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-16HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-03-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505600Amended CodeCitation Text
7505602.9Amended CodeCitation Text
7505607.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback