IL HB2741 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the enhanced penalties for an attempt to commit first degree murder while armed with a firearm, during which the person personally discharged a firearm, or during which the person personally discharged a firearm that proximately caused great bodily harm, permanent disability, permanent disfigurement, or death to another person apply to an attempt to commit first degree murder of a peace officer, fireman, correctional institution or facility employee, EMT, ambulance driver, or medical assistance or first aid personnel employed by a governmental unit attempted to be killed in the performance of his or her official duties, to prevent the performance of his or her official duties, or in retaliation for the performance of his or her official duties, or an attempt to commit first degree murder of an inmate of a correctional institution or facility on the grounds of the institution or facility, or of a person present in the institution or facility with the knowledge of the chief administrative officer of the institution or facility. Reenacts the provisions of the attempted murder statute held unconstitutional as violating the proportionate penalties clause of the Illinois Constitution in People v. Morgan, 203 Ill. 2d 994 (2003) before the Supreme Court changed its proportionality review in People v. Sharpe, 216 Ill. 2d 481 (2005).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-ATTEMPT MURDER FIREARM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72058-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback