IL HB2740 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board shall establish alternative methods of credentialing for the issuance of high school equivalency certification throughout the State. Allows the Board to offer the credentialing on or after January 1, 2018 based on high school credit, post-secondary credit, foreign diplomas, and completion of a competency-based program as approved by the Board. Makes technical and conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ALTERNATIVE CREDENTIALS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-07SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 008-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10553-15.12Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback