IL HB2738 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that all of the institutions and facilities of the Department of Corrections shall permit every committed person to receive in-person visitors, except in case of abuse of the visiting privilege or when the chief administrative officer determines that such visiting would be harmful or dangerous to the security, safety or morale of the institution or facility. Provides that an institution or facility of the Department may not charge a fee to either a committed person or visitor for video visitation that results in a profit for the Department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-VISITATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-12HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-010-000
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-05HouseCorrectional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-05HouseFiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2017-03-28HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-001-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-15HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-03-14HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-14HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-7-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback