IL HB2731 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to conduct a study comparing airborne emission reductions of coal-fired electric generating units within the State of Illinois between 1990 and 2016 and forecasting additional reductions for the period from 2017 to 2020. Requires the Agency to identify where and how Agency policies have led to such reductions and are likely to lead to additional reductions going forward and which Illinois regulations are unnecessary because of more stringent State or federal regulations. Requires the Agency to consult with the owners of each coal-fired electric generating unit in the State when compiling this information. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-COAL-FIRED GENERATING UNIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 020-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2731&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2731.htm |