IL HB2725 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that money received by the State from the federal government under the Recreational Trails Program shall not be considered for use as aid in construction of highways, and shall not be placed in the "Road Fund" in the State Treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HWY CD-RECREATION TRAIL FUNDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-06SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60553-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback