IL HB2722 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Construction Bond Act. Provides for bonds issued under the Act to be used for, among other conditions, the payment of apparatus, fixtures, and machinery used in the completion of a contract. Provides that the terms "material", "labor", "apparatus", "fixtures", and "machinery" include those rented items that are on the construction site and those rented tools that are used or consumed on the construction site in the performance of the contract on account of which the bond is given. Makes conforming changes.
Title
PUBLIC CONSTRUCTION BONDS
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] |
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0065 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-028-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-002-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 550 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 550 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |