IL HB2722 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act, the Firearm Concealed Carry Act, and the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person convicted of various violations concerning the unlawful carrying or possession of a firearm, stun gun, or taser shall, in addition to any penalties provided for the violation, be subject to a mental health evaluation by a physician, qualified examiner, psychiatrist, or clinical psychologist to determine whether the person may be diagnosed with a mental health disorder, verified by a diagnosis contained in the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders-Fifth Edition published by the American Psychiatric Association (DSM-V), or its successor, or International Classification of Diseases, 10th Revision, Clinical Modification (ICD-10-CM), or its successor, that substantially impairs a person's cognitive, emotional, or behavioral functioning, or any combination of those.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM OFFENSE-MENT HLTH EVAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-08-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-07-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-07-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-07-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4306514Amended CodeCitation Text
4306670Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback