IL HB2717 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 042-061-003
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 042-061-003
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, subject to certain restrictions, if the Department of Revenue may disclose confidential financial information to a municipality or county, then the Department of Revenue may also disclose that financial information to an independent third party who is authorized in writing by that municipality or county to receive the information. Effective immediately.
Title
ROTA-SHARE INFORMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 42 N: 61 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 042-061-003 |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-04-24 | House | Motion Prevailed 060-048-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-002-000 |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-09 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |