IL HB2710 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Behavior Analyst Licensing Act. Provides for licensure of behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts. Creates the Advisory Board of Behavior Analysts. Provides qualifications for licensure application, including for those who have met certain requirements before the effective date of the Act. Establishes the powers and duties of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation, including, but not limited to, adopting rules setting forth minimum standards for licensure, taking disciplinary or nondisciplinary actions, and authorizing examinations. Provides for grounds for disciplinary actions and for civil and criminal penalties for violations of the Act. Creates provisions concerning hearings, appointment of hearing officers, and rehearings. Provides for judicial review of all final administrative decisions of the Department. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Provides that the Behavior Analyst Licensing Act is repealed on January 1, 2030. Effective immediately.
Title
BEHAVIOR ANALYST-LICENSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-04 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |