IL HB2704 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that certain payroll certifications must be made by the agency head (instead of the Director of Central Management Services).
Title
PERSONNEL-PAYROLL CERT
Sponsors
Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0124 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 415 | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |