IL HB2700 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consent by Minors to Medical Procedures Act. Provides that provisions concerning the giving of consent to the performance of procedures or services apply to the giving of consent to the performance of procedures or services by a licensed optometrist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSENT TO MEDICAL CARE-MINORS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0378
2017-08-25HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-014-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4102101Amended CodeCitation Text
4102101.5Amended CodeCitation Text
4102102Amended CodeCitation Text
4102103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback