IL HB2699 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions of the Unemployment Insurance Act prohibiting the disclosure of information obtained from an individual or employing unit during the administration of the Act. In language providing that the prohibition does not apply to communication with an individual or entity through unencrypted e-mail or unencrypted electronic means as long as the communication does not contain the individual's or entity's name in combination with specified numbers or codes, deletes "account number" from the numbers and codes. Effective immediately.
Title
UNEMP INS-INFO DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0484 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date September 8, 2017 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-25 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-25 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 100-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-04-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 029-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 1900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |