IL HB2695 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004. Provides that reasonable attorney's fees and costs may be awarded to a licensee, interested party, or person injured if he or she successfully obtains injunctive relief, whether by consent or otherwise. Effective immediately.
Title
DETECTIVE-INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2017-03-22 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-001-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-24 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 447 | 40-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2695&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2695.htm |