IL HB2695 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code, the Illinois Highway Code, and the Toll Highway Act. Provides that on and after January 1, 2016, 25% of all vehicles purchased with State funds shall be vehicles fueled by electricity, compressed natural gas, liquid petroleum gas, or liquid natural gas. Provides that by January 1, 2016, the Illinois Department of Transportation shall construct and maintain at least one electric vehicle charging station at each rest area on State highways. Provides that by January 1, 2016, the Toll Highway Authority shall construct and maintain at least one electric vehicle charging station at any location where the Authority has entered into an agreement with any entity for the purposes of providing motor fuel service stations and facilities, garages, stores, or restaurants along the toll highways. Directs the Department and Authority to adopt rules to implement these requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALT FUEL CARS/CHARGE STATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 85 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 85 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-16HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0442
2013-08-16HouseEffective Date January 1, 2014
2013-08-16HouseGovernor Approved
2013-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2013-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2013-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2013-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 085-032-000
2013-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 085-032-000
2013-05-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2013-05-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2013-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David Harris
2013-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David Harris
2013-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2013-05-22HouseArrived in House
2013-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2013
2013-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2013-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2013
2013-05-15SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
2013-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2013-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2013-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2013-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2013-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2013-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
2013-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
2013-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2013-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
2013-05-08SenateAssigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2013-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2013-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2013-04-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
2013-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2013
2013-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2013-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2013-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-026-000
2013-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2013-04-18HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2013-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2013-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
2013-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
2013-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2013-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2013-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2013-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
2013-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2013-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000
2013-03-04HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2013-02-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-02-21HouseFirst Reading
2013-02-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050025-75Amended CodeCitation Text
6051011Amended CodeCitation Text
6055223New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2695&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2695.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2695ham001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2695eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2695ham002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2695ham003.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2695sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2695sam002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2695enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/98/098-0442.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800HB2695_04192013_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800HB2695_05222013_034000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800HB2695_05292013_028001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800HB2695_05292013_028000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback